Nelson, Alexander Michel (CPSO#: 99921)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2013 to 05 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 03 May 2016 to 30 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2016