skip to content

Nelles, Constance Ruth Macklem

CPSO#: 25346

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
25 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 May 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 11 St Regis Crescent S North York ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 25 May 2021


Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 22 Nov 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 May 2021