skip to content

Neimanis, Ieva Marija

CPSO#: 31135

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: I.M. Neimanis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 801 Mohawk Road West Suite 204 Hamilton ON L9C 6C2
Date Received: 16 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2017