skip to content

Jha, Neilank Kumar

CPSO#: 81135

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. N. Jha Medical Clinic
Unit 37
7575 HWY 27
Vaughan ON  L4L 4M5
Phone: 905-851-5539
Fax: 905-264-7909 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Neilank Jha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jha ( CPSO# 81135 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2004

Business Address:
7575 Highway 27
Suite 37
Vaughan ON  L4L 4M5
Phone Number: (905) 851-5539

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEILANK KUMAR JHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Aug 2020
Summary:

The College alleged that Dr. Jha committed an act professional misconduct under subsection 
 51(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is schedule 2 to the Regulated 
 Health Professions Act, 1991 (the “Code”), in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is 
 relevant to his suitability to practise.  
 On May 26 and June 1, 2020, a hearing proceeded before the Discipline Committee, which 
reserved its decision. 
On August 27, 2020, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Jha committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability 
to practise. On December 17, 2015, Dr. Jha had pleaded guilty to one count of assault and one 
count of mischief under $5,000 contrary to sections 266 and 430(4) of the Criminal Code. The 
charges arose in a domestic context, involving Dr. Jha’s then fiancée. On July 15, 2016, Dr. Jha 
was granted an absolute discharge pursuant to section 730(1) of the Criminal Code in respect of 
the criminal charges. In its decision released on September 2, 2020, the Committee found that 
Dr. Jha had been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice, and that 
the offence was relevant to Dr. Jha’s suitability to practice notwithstanding the discharge. 
The Committee held a penalty hearing on January 7, 2021, via videoconference. In its decision 
released on April 16, 2021, the Committee ordered and directed with respect to penalty and 
costs: 
-Dr. Jha shall appear before the Committee to be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand 
shall be recorded on the Register; 
-The Registrar to suspend Dr. Jha‘s certificate of registration for a period of three months, to 
commence 60 days from the date of this order.  
-Dr. Jha pay to the College costs in the amount of $51,850 within 60 days of the date of this 
order. 
 

Appeal: 
On May 11, 2021, Dr. Jha appealed to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court) from the 
decisions of the Discipline Committee on a motion to quash, dated February 24, 2020, on the 
finding decision dated September 2, 2020 and on the penalty decision dated April 16, 2021. 
Pursuant to ss.25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, the decision of the Discipline 
Committee is stayed pending the outcome of the appeal.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Motion Jan 9 & 24, 2020 Hearing May 26 and June 1, 2020 Penalty Hearing: January 7, 2021