skip to content

Neighbour, Helen

CPSO#: 91676

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Firestone Institute for
Respiratory Health
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34324
Fax: (905) 521-6183 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Helen Neighbour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Neighbour ( CPSO# 91676 )

Business Address:
Firestone Institute for Respiratory Health
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective:30 Jun 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:23 Jan 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2020 Active
 Dr.  Helen  Neighbour  may  practise  medicine independently in respirology and
            internal medicine.