skip to content

Nehra, Lollita Juliette

CPSO#: 28655

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 07 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Sep 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

On October 27, 2009, the Executive Committee referred the matter of Dr. Nehra's incapacity to the Fitness to Practise Committee.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: November 18, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Lollita Juliette Nehra has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.