skip to content

Nefsky, Colman Henry

CPSO#: 86602

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
Department of Mental Health
Room 5M29
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: (416) 530-6076 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 116B
617 Victoria St. W
Whitby ON  L1N 0E4
Canada
Phone: 905-668-2975
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Nefsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nefsky ( CPSO# 86602 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Centre
Department of Mental Health
Room 5M29
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
Suite 1168
617 Victoria Street
Whitby ON  L1N 0E4
Phone Number: (905) 668-2975

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:15 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective:22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COLMAN HENRY NEFSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEFSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012