Needham, Leslie (CPSO#: 98395)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
227 Algonquin Boulevard West
Timmins ON  P4N 2R8
Phone: (705) 360-5808
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leslie Needham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Needham ( CPSO# 98395 )

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
700 Ross Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
Unit 4
227 Algonquin Boulevard East
Timmins ON  P4N 2R8
Phone Number: (705) 360-5808

Business Address:
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Phone Number: (705) 560-2227

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE NEEDHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEEDHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014