skip to content

Anssari, Neda

CPSO#: 117061

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: Shiraz University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 2A7
Phone: 6479488895
Fax: 4313170636 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:27 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEDA ANSSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSSARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2020