skip to content

Nebhwani, Neetu Vasudev

CPSO#: 97332

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Pune, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Neetu Nebhwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 3 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2014