Neata, Adelaida Iulia (CPSO#: 100693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Healthcare, FIT Clinic
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3666 Ext. 3665
Fax: (416)285-3663
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Seniors' Health Centre
2 Buchan Court
Toronto ON  M2J 5A3
Canada
Phone: (416)756-6050 Ext. 8066
Fax: 416-756-1844
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Baycrest Health Sciences
3560 Baycrest Avenue
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: 416 785-2500
Fax: 416 785-4210
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADELAIDA IULIA NEATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEATA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 17 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2017