skip to content

Neale, Richard William

CPSO#: 31287

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 25 Jun 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Dec 1984
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 25 Jun 1985

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Jun 1985
Summary:

 In June 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Neale incompetent, as defined in s. 60(4) of the 
 Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a 
 patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a 
 nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice.  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Neale(s licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 24 Jun 1985