skip to content

Ndubisi, Ihuoma Ugonna

CPSO#: 97426

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ibo

Education:University of Lagos, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1190 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1B4
Phone: (519) 252-3335
Fax: (519) 252-1529 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel dieu Grace Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 257-5111
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Psychiatry
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4444
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Psychiatry
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-1661
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Canadian Mental Health Association
1400 Windsor Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 255-7440
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: I.U. Ndubisi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ndubisi ( CPSO# 97426 )

Business Address:
1190 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1B4
Phone Number: (519) 252-3335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IHUOMA UGONNA NDUBISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NDUBISI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2015