skip to content

Ndubisi, Chukwulo Christopher

CPSO#: 97315

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C.C. Ndubisi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 15 Mar 2016 to 18 Jul 2016
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 19 Jul 2016 to 14 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2016