skip to content

Nayyer, Habiba Mariam

CPSO#: 96241

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300-1100 Burloak Dr
Burlington ON  L7L 6B2
Phone: 905-332-1320
Fax: 905-332-3007 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HABIBA MARIAM NAYYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
AVP - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Oct 2018
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016