skip to content

Nayot, Dan

CPSO#: 86503

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2180 Meadowvale Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3
Phone: 905-816-9822
Fax: 905-816-9833 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nayot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAN NAYOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYOT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012