skip to content

Nayan, Smriti

CPSO#: 91140

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 8L4
Phone: (519) 624-8877
Fax: (519) 489-2775 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Smriti Nayan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nayan ( CPSO# 91140 )

Business Address:
1 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 8L4
Phone Number: (519) 624-8877

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SMRITI NAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014