skip to content

Nayak Rao, Shobhan G

CPSO#: 94864

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Dec 2020
EXPIRY DATE
15 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Clinical Fellow) as of 25 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Nayak-Rao, Shobhana (used until: 01 Jul 2019 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bangalore University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2011 to 25 Apr 2011
PEAP - CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 26 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2020 to 15 Dec 2020
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2020