skip to content

Nawaz, Shah

CPSO#: 27073

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Oct 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shah Nawaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020