skip to content

Nawaz, Ahmad

CPSO#: 31963

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Glasgow, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS, 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6, 1-(888)563-3732
Date Received: 13 Aug 2015


Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Incorporated 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Telephone: (416)-398-0638 Fax: (416)-342-1052 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 23 Oct 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015