skip to content

Navarro, Joaquin Ximo Ruiz

CPSO#: 28144

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 11 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Jan 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Ruiz-Navarro, Joaquin Francisco (used until: 10 Jan 1985 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Valencia, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. & M. Navarro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Access Services Canada Inc 854 Upper Canada Drive Sarnia ON N7W 1A4 1 800 971 8038 (p) 1 800 928 2503 (f) [email protected]
Date Received: 11 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jan 2018