skip to content

Nathoo, Sameer Bharat

CPSO#: 99478

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Oct 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts
179 James St S
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A3
Phone: (905) 777-9779
Fax: (905) 777-9550 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southmount Health Care Centre
35 Upper Centennial Pkwy
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: 905-662-3385
Fax: 905-592-2325
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

3420 Rebecca Street
Unit 6 & 7
LAKESHORE WOODS MEDICAL CLINIC
Oakville ON  L6K 6W2
Canada
Phone: 905-847-2525
Fax: 905-847-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Halton Family Health Centre
Unit 303
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Canada
Phone: 905-336-9635
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sameer Nathoo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nathoo ( CPSO# 99478 )

Business Address:
Medica One
35 Upper Centenial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3385

Business Address:
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-9635

Business Address:
Suite 6
3420 Rebecca Street
Oakville ON  L6K 6W2
Phone Number: (905) 847-2525

Business Address:
179 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A3
Phone Number: (905) 777-9779

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014 Active
                   Dr.  Sameer  Bharat  Nathoo may practise medicine independently in family
                  medicine, only.