skip to content

Nugent, Nathan Zane

CPSO#: 79686

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Dec 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2024

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1133 Sheppard Ave W
Defence Research & Development Cana
North York ON  M3K 2C9
Phone: 416-635-2000 Ext. 2014 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATHAN ZANE NUGENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUGENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2023
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 27 Sep 2023
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 27 Dec 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2024

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 26 Sep 2023
Summary:

On September 26, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Nugent had been found guilty of the offence of assault, contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code, which was relevant to his suitability to practise. The Tribunal further found that the conduct underlying this finding of guilt was conduct unbecoming a physician and conduct that would be reasonably regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Tribunal also found that Dr. Nugent engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to disclose to the College that he was charged with criminal offences and was subject to conditions of release.

The Tribunal ordered that: 
  1. Dr. Nugent attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Nugent’s certificate of registration for three (3) months commencing September 27, 2023 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Nugent’s certificate of registration; 
  4. Dr. Nugent pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by November 10, 2023.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].  
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty, Reprimand; 2023-09-26