skip to content

Nathan, Howard Jack

CPSO#: 25905

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H.J. Nathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 28 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Health Records Department 501 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 21 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Jan 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2018