skip to content

Yepes Restrepo, Natasha

CPSO#: 79369

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Instituto De Ciencias De La Salud, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
31 KIngsbury Drive
Kitchener ON  N2A 0K5
Phone: 519 745 6556
Fax: (519) 342-1244 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Natasha Yepes Restrepo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Castano Herrera ( CPSO# 78746 )
Dr. N. Yepes Restrepo ( CPSO# 79369 )

Business Address:
31 Kingsway Drive
Suite 501
Kitchener ON  N2A 2L9
Phone Number: (519) 745-6556


Corporation Name: Castano Herrera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Castano Herrera ( CPSO# 78746 )
Dr. N. Yepes Restrepo ( CPSO# 79369 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
P.O. Box 9056 Station C
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:15 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATASHA YEPES RESTREPO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEPES RESTREPO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 22 Aug 2003
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
International Specialist Physician - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009