skip to content

Nasseri, Eiman

CPSO#: 98642

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital, 1053 Carling Avenue, Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 02 May 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016