skip to content

Nasser, Yasmin

CPSO#: 100819

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Division of Gastroenterology and Hepatology University of Calgary Department of Medicine Area 2, FMC Gastroenterology Clinic 3350 Hospital Drive Northwest Calgary, AB T2N 4Z5
Date Received: 26 Apr 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016