skip to content

Nasri, Masood Ahmad

CPSO#: 85491

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 3829
Fax: (519) 749-4455 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

65 Bridgeport Road East
Waterloo ON  N2J2K1
Canada
Phone: 519-725-7635
Fax: 226-475-0113
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Nasri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nasri ( CPSO# 85491 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:09 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Oct 2007

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2007 Active
             Dr. Masood Ahmad Nasri may practise independently in the area of Psychiatry.