skip to content

Nashid, Nancy

CPSO#: 95329

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital, LHSC
Department of Pediatrics
Division of Infectious Diseases
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A5W9
Phone: 5196858299
Fax: 5196858156 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NANCY NASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASHID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015