skip to content

Nash, Martin

CPSO#: 18303

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2004
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: March 11, 2004
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On March 11, 2004, Dr. Martin Nash signed the following undertaking to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

I, Dr. Martin Nash, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, no later than June 1, 2004.

I promise not to apply for registration as a physician or a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

I consent to this undertaking being entered in the register as information that is available to the public.

I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario has agreed to withdraw the allegation that Dr. Nash engaged in impropriety with a patient as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated August 21, 2003, which allegation of professional misconduct is currently pending before the Discipline Committee.

I have obtained independent legal advice before giving this undertaking.

The CPSO withdrew the allegation of professional misconduct on August 16, 2004.