skip to content

Nash, Christopher Michael Robert

CPSO#: 90750

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:21 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective:05 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 26 Oct 2012
EL - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 05 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2016