skip to content

Naser, Mohamed Sadiq Mohamed

CPSO#: 97198

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Oct 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Peshawar, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 629-3801 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Naser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Naser ( CPSO# 97198 )

Business Address:
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
Department of Medicine
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:01 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMED SADIQ MOHAMED NASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 24 Apr 2012
PEAP - CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2017