Narula, Monica (CPSO#: 96919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bronte Medical Group
78 Jones St.
Oakville ON  L6L 6C5
Phone: (905) 827-9865
Fax: (905) 827-3583
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

526 Bryne Dr.
Unit B
Barrie ON  L4N 9P6
Canada
Phone: 705-735-0639
Fax: 705-721-8437
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica Narula Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narula ( CPSO# 96919 )

Business Address:
78 Jones Street
Oakville ON  L6L 6C5
Phone Number: (905) 827-9865

Business Address:
526 Bryne Drive
Unit B
Barrie ON  L4N 9P6
Phone Number: (705) 735-0639

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA NARULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARULA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jan 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013