skip to content

Narayansingh, Marc Jevan

CPSO#: 89662

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3N5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7547 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Malvern Sleep Clinic
1371 Nielsen Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 282-9119
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

TSPC, 123 Edward St
Suite 1011
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416)-813-2277
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 303, 1835 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4S1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-792-9436
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Narayansingh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narayansingh ( CPSO# 89662 )

Business Address:
Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Suite 1011
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2

Business Address:
Sleep Care Solutions
Suite 303
1835 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 792-9436

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Malvern Sleep Clinic
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 282-9119

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARC JEVAN NARAYANSINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYANSINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2008 to 29 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010