skip to content

Naqvi, Syed Ahmed Saeed

CPSO#: 92326

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sind Medical College, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 25 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2010 to 25 Mar 2011
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2011 to 25 Mar 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2012 to 25 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Mar 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017