skip to content

Naqvi, Asghar Hussain

CPSO#: 92190

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Aligarh Muslim University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Pathology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 9055221155 Ext. 33970 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:12 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASGHAR HUSSAIN NAQVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAQVI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2012