skip to content

Nanka-Bruce, Richard Henry Merton

CPSO#: 28910

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 22 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Mar 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2006
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 22 Mar 2006

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Mar 2006
Summary:

On March 22, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Nanka Bruce to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of offences that are relevant to his suitability to practise, those offences being, two counts of indecent assault and two counts of sexual assault involving four patients, imposed by the Superior Court of Justice on January 13, 2006. The assaults took place in his office, during what purported to be clinical examinations. The Committee ordered that Dr. Nanka-Bruce's certificate of registration be revoked immediately.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 22, 2006

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 31 Mar 2003
Summary:

On March 31, 2003, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Nanka-Bruce to have committed an act of professional misconduct relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee ordered the following penalty:

1) Dr. Nanka-Bruce attend befored the panel to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2) That a condition or limitation be imposed on the certificate of registration of Dr. Nanka- Bruce that he not conduct any physical examinations of female patients except in the presence of a third party who is at leat 21 years of age and is acceptable to the Registrar of the College.

3) That Dr. Nanka-Bruce may apply to the College for a variation or revocation of the condition set out in paragraph 2 above, which application shall be made no earlier than one year after the date of this order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 31, 2003