skip to content

Nanjundan, Gopal

CPSO#: 23818

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010