skip to content

Nanji, Sulaiman

CPSO#: 87334

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
2.055 Burr 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3534
Fax: (613) 548-2500 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Nanji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nanji ( CPSO# 87334 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SULAIMAN NANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007