skip to content

Nandra, Sukhjeen Kaur

CPSO#: 91161

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Health Services Georgetown
c/o Department of Family Medicine
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: 905-873-0111 Ext. 8232 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

202 - 710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Canada
Phone: (905) 607-0022
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 304-0062
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 6G3
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-9030
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

32-1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Canada
Phone: 905-335-1888
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

2225 Erin Mills Parkway #183
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Canada
Phone: (905) 823-0223
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2227 South Millway #303
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: 905 569 7007
Fax: (905) 569-7056
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 207
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Canada
Phone: 905 631-2080
Fax: 905 635-6215
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M4E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-5501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sukhjeen Nandra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nandra ( CPSO# 91161 )

Business Address:
Halton Health Services Georgetown
Department of Anaesthesiology
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
202 - 710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Phone Number: (905) 607-0022

Business Address:
1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 304-9030

Business Address:
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 6G3
Phone Number: (905) 790-9030

Business Address:
A-7
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 495-5200

Business Address:
Suite 303
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-7007

Business Address:
Suite 32
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 335-1888

Business Address:
Suite 207
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 631-2080

Business Address:
Suite 4
45 Hannover Drive
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 684-9999

Business Address:
Suite 206
688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3B6
Phone Number: (416) 463-7007

Business Address:
Suite 300
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501

Business Address:
Suite 183
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUKHJEEN KAUR NANDRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANDRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012