skip to content

Nambiar, Sindhu

CPSO#: 89660

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:Calicut University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hosptial
Department of Internal Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:29 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2008 to 01 Feb 2009
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012 Active
 Dr.  Sindhu Nambiar may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine as
            a Hospitalist, only.