skip to content

Nalla, Bhanu Prasad

CPSO#: 91526

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:University of London, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Anaesthesia
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bhanu Nalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Nalla ( CPSO# 91526 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:09 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BHANU PRASAD NALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 19 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2014