skip to content

Nakajima, Shinichiro

CPSO#: 96503

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Keio Gijuku Daigaku Igakubu, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Japan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017