skip to content

Najib, Syed Samir

CPSO#: 97810

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Gulf Medical College Ajman, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cleveland Clinic Canada
181 Bay Street, Suite 3000
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone: (416) 507-6753
Fax: (416) 507-6750 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cleveland Clinic Canada
181 Bay Street, Suite 3000
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
Phone: (416) 507-6753
Fax: (416) 507-6750
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

360 CARDIOLOGY & DIAGNOSTIC CENTRE
106 Humber College Blvd
Suite 211
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4E4
Canada
Phone: (647) 349-2003
Fax: (647) 350-2004
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2-10350 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5K9
Canada
Phone: 905-237-5433
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3905 Major MacKenzie Dr W
Woodbridge ON  L4H 4J9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

500-491 Lawrence Ave W
North York ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Syed Najib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Najib ( CPSO# 97810 )

Business Address:
211 - 106 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4E4
Phone Number: (647) 349-2003

Business Address:
Cleveland Clinic Canada
3000 - 181 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 507-6600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SYED SAMIR NAJIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAJIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Cardiology

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014