skip to content

Naji, Nizar Abbas

CPSO#: 96766

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Essex Respiratory Services
109 - 13278 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 956-9891
Fax: (519) 956-8082 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

205-1408 Ernest Ave
London ON  N6E 3B2
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Naji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Naji ( CPSO# 96766 )

Business Address:
Suite 109
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6

Business Address:
Suite 205
1408 Ernest Avenue
London ON  N6E 3B2

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective:15 Dec 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:08 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIZAR ABBAS NAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 11 Nov 2011
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 12 Nov 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2015