skip to content

Nair, Saeda Sabarinath

CPSO#: 96575

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kerala, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Anesthesia
Hsc 2V14
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Nair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nair ( CPSO# 96413 )
Dr. S. Nair ( CPSO# 96575 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Aug 2014
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Saeda Sabarinath Nair may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anesthesia,  McMaster  University,  in  which  Dr.  Nair  holds  an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or  when  Dr.  Nair  no  longer  holds  the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the  following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives a report indicating that Dr. Nair's clinical
                        performance, knowledge,  skill,  judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee does not receive an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Nair's certificate of
                        registration,  following  consideration  of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2016, and expires on June 30, 2022.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Nair's academic appointment  at  McMaster University,
                  the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs
                  2 and 3 above.