skip to content

Nair, Sabarinath Balachandran

CPSO#: 96413

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Mar 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Mar 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42247 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Nair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nair ( CPSO# 96413 )
Dr. S. Nair ( CPSO# 96575 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Nov 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 18 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2019 Active
             Dr.  Sabarinath  Balachandran  Nair  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            interventional radiology and diagnostic radiology.