skip to content

Siraj, Naila

CPSO#: 81381

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone: (905) 505-0950 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Naila Siraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Siraj ( CPSO# 81381 )

Business Address:
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAILA SIRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIRAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2006