skip to content

Naik, Anjana Thakorbhai

CPSO#: 88175

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kerala, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 Water St
Sarnia ON  N7T 5T3
Phone: (519) 491-1119
Fax: (519) 491-1469 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anil A. Garach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naik ( CPSO# 88175 )
Dr. A. Garach ( CPSO# 85828 )

Business Address:
110 Water Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 5T3
Phone Number: (519) 332-3330


Corporation Name: Dr. Anjana Naik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naik ( CPSO# 88175 )
Dr. M. Garach ( CPSO# 110046)

Business Address:
110 Water Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 5T3
Phone Number: (519) 491-1119

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANJANA THAKORBHAI NAIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Mar 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2010