skip to content

Naidu, Padmaja Rakesh

CPSO#: 96647

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Baroda University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1720 Howard Avenue, Suite 164
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 948-8000
Fax: (519) 948-9191 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Leamington District Memorial Hospit
194 Talbot street west
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

WINDSOR REGIONAL HOSPITAL OUELLETTE
1030 OUELLETTE AVENUE
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

305-700 Tecumseh Rd E
Bayshore infusion clinic
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Canada
Phone: +1 877-235-779
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Padmaja Naidu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Naidu ( CPSO# 96647 )

Business Address:
164 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 948-8000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:27 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active
                   Dr.  Padmaja Rakesh Naidu may practise medicine independently in internal
                  medicine, only.